Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teotimo Cruel Pacis, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1913BornTiwi
20 Mar 194329.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
18 Nov 196653.5AppointedBishop of Palo, Philippines
25 Jan 196753.7Ordained BishopBishop of Palo, Philippines
23 May 196956.0AppointedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
4 Jun 198067.1ResignedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
8 Jul 198471.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Legazpi, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Teotimo Cruel Pacis:
Bishop Teotimo Cruel Pacis C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 29 Jul 2015