Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lino Rasdesales Gonzaga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1906BornJaro
19 Mar 192922.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 195145.4AppointedBishop of Palo, Philippines
28 Jan 195245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Palo, Philippines
12 Aug 196660.1AppointedArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
25 Aug 197367.2ResignedArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
15 Aug 198074.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Lino Rasdesales Gonzaga:
Archbishop Lino Rasdesales Gonzaga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 6
  • mn: CB, 3 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 6 Aug 2015