Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philip Francis Smith, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cotabato, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1924Born
29 Oct 195026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
26 Jun 197247.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
26 Jun 197247.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamphua
8 Sep 197247.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamphua
11 Apr 197954.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cotabato, Philippines
5 Nov 197955.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cotabato, Philippines
14 Mar 198055.4SucceededArchbishop of Cotabato, Philippines
30 May 199873.6RetiredArchbishop of Cotabato, Philippines
30 Sep 200277.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cotabato, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Philip Francis Smith
Archbishop Philip Francis Smith O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cotabato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLowell, MA, USA

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast