Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romulo Tolentino de la Cruz

Archbishop of Zamboanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1947 BornBalasan
8 Dec 197225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cotabato, Philippines
17 Dec 198740.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Isabela, Philippines
16 Mar 198840.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Isabela, Philippines
28 Jan 198941.6SucceededBishop of Isabela, Philippines
8 Jan 200153.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
16 Mar 200254.7SucceededBishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
14 May 200860.9AppointedBishop of Kidapawan, Philippines
19 Jun 200861.0InstalledBishop of Kidapawan, Philippines
15 Mar 201466.7AppointedArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
14 May 201466.9InstalledArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Romulo Tolentino de la Cruz:
Archbishop Romulo Tolentino de la Cruz (born ) Archbishop of Zamboanga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Zamboanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,614
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2014
  • i: CB, 8 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Apr 2014