Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leo Magdugo Dalmao, C.M.F.

Prelate of Isabela, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1969 Born
1986²16.0EnteredMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
3 May 199222.4First VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
16 Jul 199626.6Perpetual VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
31 May 199727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
25 Mar 201949.3AppointedPrelate of Isabela, Philippines
24 May 201949.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Isabela, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leo Magdugo Dalmao
Father Leo Magdugo Dalmao C.M.F. (born ) Prelate of Isabela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTagbilaran, Bohol, Diocese of Tagbilaran
Ordained PriestImmaculate Heart of Mary, Church, Quezon City
Ordained BishopSaint Elizabeth de Portugal, Cathedral, Isabela City, Territorial Prelature of Isabela

Please contact the Father through the Territorial Prelature of Isabela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2019
  • mn: CB, 25 Mar 2019
  • c1/prof: CB, 26 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 9 Apr 2019
  • c2+: CB, 24 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Apr 2019

Quantcast