Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin Sarmiento Jumoad

Archbishop of Ozamiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1956 BornKinasang-am
7 Apr 198326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Isabela, Philippines
21 Nov 200145.0AppointedPrelate of Isabela, Philippines
10 Jan 200245.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Isabela, Philippines
4 Oct 201659.8AppointedArchbishop of Ozamiz, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Martin Sarmiento Jumoad
Archbishop Martin Sarmiento Jumoad (born ) Archbishop of Ozamiz

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ozamiz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,113
  • mn: CB, 24 Jul 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Oct 2016