Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelito Rendon Lampon, O.M.I.

Archbishop of Cotabato, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1950 Born
1 Apr 197727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 Nov 199747.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
21 Nov 199747.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Valliposita
6 Jan 199847.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valliposita
6 Nov 201868.6AppointedArchbishop of Cotabato, Philippines
31 Jan 201968.9InstalledArchbishop of Cotabato, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Angelito Rendon Lampon
Archbishop Angelito Rendon Lampon O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop of Cotabato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceM'Lang
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cotabato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,187
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2018
  • i: CB, 30 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast