Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charlie Malapitan Inzon, O.M.I.

Vicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1965 Born
1982²16.1EnteredMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 May 198620.4First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Sep 199024.7Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
24 Apr 199327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
4 Apr 202054.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
21 May 202054.4Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
16 Jul 202054.6InstalledVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charlie Malapitan Inzon
Bishop Charlie Malapitan Inzon O.M.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Jolo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePutiao
Ordained PriestColoocan City
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Cotabato, Archdiocese of Cotabato

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Jolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2020
  • mn/firs: CB, 4 Apr 2020
  • ob: CB, 20 May 2020
  • i: CB, 21 May 2020
  • i: CB, 15 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Jul 2020

Quantcast