Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Colin Mendoza Bagaforo

Bishop of Kidapawan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1954 Born
25 Mar 198026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cotabato, Philippines
2 Feb 200652.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cotabato, Philippines
2 Feb 200652.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari-Didda
25 Apr 200652.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari-Didda
25 Jul 201662.4AppointedBishop of Kidapawan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Colin Mendoza Bagaforo
Bishop José Colin Mendoza Bagaforo (born ) Bishop of Kidapawan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotabato

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kidapawan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,143
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018