Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bienvenido Solon Tudtud

Deceased

Prelate of Marawi

Titular Bishop of Thimida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1931BornCebu-City
2 Feb 195927.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 196836.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dumaguete, Philippines
5 Feb 196836.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thimida
24 Mar 196837.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thimida
17 Feb 197139.9AppointedPrelate of Iligan, Philippines
25 Apr 197746.0AppointedPrelate of Marawi, Philippines
26 Jun 198756.2DiedPrelate of Marawi, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Bienvenido Solon Tudtud:
Bishop Bienvenido Solon Tudtud (born , died ) Prelate of Marawi

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015