Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel P. Del Rosario

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malolos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1915BornBaao
25 Mar 193923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sorsogon, Philippines
24 May 195539.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Calbayog, Philippines
24 May 195539.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zerta
25 Jul 195540.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zerta
25 Jul 195843.0SucceededBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
11 Dec 196146.4AppointedBishop of Malolos, Philippines
11 Mar 196246.6InstalledBishop of Malolos, Philippines
15 Dec 197762.4ResignedBishop of Malolos, Philippines
23 Mar 200993.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Malolos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Manuel P. Del Rosario:
Bishop Manuel P. Del Rosario (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malolos

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a bishop for 53.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 58
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015