Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Van den Ouwelant, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Surigao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1911BornZundert
10 Aug 193625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
23 Mar 195543.7AppointedBishop of Surigao, Philippines
21 Jun 195544.0Ordained BishopBishop of Surigao, Philippines
10 Jan 197361.5ResignedBishop of Surigao, Philippines
22 Aug 200392.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Surigao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Charles Van den Ouwelant:
Bishop Charles Van den Ouwelant M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Surigao

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 46
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013