Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Valdesco Del Rosario, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga

Titular Archbishop of Thiges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1886BornBinondo
17 Dec 191024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Mar 193346.4AppointedBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
4 Jun 193346.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
19 May 195871.6AppointedArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
12 Aug 196679.8RetiredArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
12 Aug 196679.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thiges
22 Sep 197083.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Luis Valdesco Del Rosario:
Archbishop Luis Valdesco Del Rosario S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c34: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 28
  • mn: CB, 24 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 25 Jul 2015