Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clovis Joseph Thibauld (Thibault), P.M.E. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Davao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1910BornDanville, Canada
24 Jun 193424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
29 Dec 195444.8AppointedPrelate of Davao, Philippines
29 Dec 195444.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
11 Feb 195544.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
11 Jul 196656.3AppointedBishop of Davao, Philippines
29 Jun 197060.3AppointedArchbishop of Davao, Philippines
9 Dec 197262.7ResignedArchbishop of Davao, Philippines
20 Apr 197565.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Davao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Clovis Joseph Thibauld (Thibault):
Archbishop Clovis Joseph Thibauld (Thibault) P.M.E. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Davao

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ab: CB, 29 Jul 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013