Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Thomas Gibbons Hayes, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagayan de Oro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1889BornNew York, NY, USA
29 Jun 192132.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Mar 193344.0AppointedBishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
18 Jun 193344.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
29 Jun 195162.3AppointedArchbishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
13 Oct 197081.6RetiredArchbishop of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
13 Oct 197081.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabii
2 Dec 197081.8ResignedTitular Archbishop of Gabii
28 Mar 198091.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for James Thomas Gibbons Hayes:
Archbishop James Thomas Gibbons Hayes S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cagayan de Oro

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c34: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jul 2015