Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Christianus Vrakking, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Surigao

Titular Bishop of Cedamusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1886BornNaarden, Netherlands
13 Aug 191124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
25 May 194053.4AppointedBishop of Surigao, Philippines
21 Sep 194053.7Ordained BishopBishop of Surigao, Philippines
12 Dec 195366.9ResignedBishop of Surigao, Philippines
12 Dec 195366.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cedamusa
29 Jan 196174.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Surigao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Johannes Christianus Vrakking:
Bishop Johannes Christianus Vrakking M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Surigao

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 54
  • fn/mn: CB, 25 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015