Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph William Regan, M.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Tagum

Titular Bishop of Isinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1905BornFairhaven, MA, USA
27 Jan 192923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
1 Feb 196256.8AppointedPrelate of Tagum, Philippines
1 Feb 196256.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Isinda
25 Apr 196257.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isinda
16 May 198075.1RetiredPrelate of Tagum, Philippines
24 Oct 199489.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Tagum, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Joseph William Regan:
Bishop Joseph William Regan M.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Tagum

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013