Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Quentin Bertram Olwell, C.P. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Marbel

Titular Bishop of Thabraca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1898BornBrooklyn, NY, USA
4 Feb 192324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
19 Jan 196162.2AppointedPrelate of Marbel, Philippines
19 Jan 196162.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
25 Apr 196162.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
18 Nov 196971.0ResignedPrelate of Marbel, Philippines
30 Jan 197273.2DiedPrelate Emeritus of Marbel, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Charles Quentin Bertram Olwell:
Bishop Charles Quentin Bertram Olwell C.P. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Marbel

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013