Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yuanling [YŘanling]

Dioecesis Iuen-limensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Yuanling, Hunan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Shenchow
13 March 1925ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Changteh [Changde] (Lungshan, Sangehih, Lungshun, Paotsing, Yungsui, Kuchang, Shenchow, Luki, Cheriki, Supu, Kienehow, Fenghwang, Mayang, Yuenchow, Kiemjang, and Hwangchow) Prefecture Apostolic of Shenchow (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Shenchow
28 May 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Shenchow Vicariate Apostolic of Shenchow
Vicariate Apostolic of YŘanling [Yuanling]
10 December 1934Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Shenchow Vicariate Apostolic of YŘanling [Yuanling]
Diocese of Yuanling [YŘanling]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of YŘanling [Yuanling] Diocese of Yuanling [YŘanling]

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Shenchow
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 175, and Page 176
  • Vicariate Apostolic of YŘanling [Yuanling]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 27, Page 22
  • Diocese of Yuanling [YŘanling]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 38, Page 301, to Page 313
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024