Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan

Archidioecesis Lingayensis-Dagupanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 February 1963
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 1,565 (604 Square Miles)
  • Description: The central part of the province of Pangasinan
  • Official Web Site: http://www.lingayen-dagupan.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Jovellanos St., Dagupan City, 2400 Pangasinan, Philippines
  • Telephone: (075)523-5357
  • Fax: 522-1878

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lingayen
19 May 1928ErectedArchdiocese of Manila
Diocese of Nueva Segovia
Diocese of Lingayen (erected)
29 June 1951Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Lingayen (from Manila)
Diocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
11 February 1954Name ChangedDiocese of Lingayen Diocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
12 June 1955Territory LostDiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
Diocese of San Fernando
Territorial Prelature of Iba (erected)
16 February 1963Territory LostDiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
Diocese of San Fernando
Diocese of Cabanatuan (erected)
Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
16 February 1963ElevatedDiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
12 January 1985Territory LostArchdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan Diocese of Alaminos (erected)
Diocese of Urdaneta (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lingayen
1950931,4201,263,45673.7%6534999,408184575ap1951
Diocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
19701,110,2441,386,40880.1%783010810,280308854ap1971*
19801,295,7541,677,62777.2%921710911,887177564ap1981
1990664,785758,99687.6%5417719,363213124ap1991
1999873,2451,057,87582.5%70158510,273272826ap2000
2000873,2451,057,87582.5%70128210,649242826ap2001
2001873,2451,057,87582.5%70138310,521253226ap2002
2002873,2451,057,87582.5%68117911,053293326ap2003
20031,002,5541,215,21782.5%70118112,377183526ap2004
20041,002,0001,215,00082.5%63117413,540293226ap2005
20131,192,0001,442,00082.7%61309113,098415736ap2014
20161,156,0001,393,00083.0%79391189,796567239ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Jul 2018

Quantcast