Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Aspiras Madriaga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lingayen-Dagupan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1902BornAgoo
15 Mar 193027.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 193835.8AppointedBishop of Lingayen, Philippines
24 May 193836.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lingayen, Philippines
11 Feb 195451.7AppointedBishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
16 Feb 196360.7AppointedArchbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
7 Feb 197370.7ResignedArchbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
1 Nov 198179.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Mariano Aspiras Madriaga:
Archbishop Mariano Aspiras Madriaga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lingayen-Dagupan

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+/d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 40
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015