Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constant Jurgens, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tuguegarao, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Acarassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1879Born
15 Jun 190525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
27 Jan 192848.1AppointedBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
18 Mar 192848.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
6 May 195070.4ResignedBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
6 May 195070.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Acarassus
3 Jun 195272.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tuguegarao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Constant Jurgens
Bishop Constant Jurgens C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tuguegarao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOss, Netherlands

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c34: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 13
  • fn: CB, 21 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018