Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesus Juan Acosta Sison

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarlac, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1918Born
29 Mar 194122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
8 Mar 196344.8AppointedBishop of Tarlac, Philippines
11 May 196345.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tarlac, Philippines
21 Jan 198869.7ResignedBishop of Tarlac, Philippines
26 Mar 200485.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarlac, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jesus Juan Acosta Sison
Bishop Jesus Juan Acosta Sison (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarlac

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBautista

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • mns: CB, 19 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast