Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San Fernando

Archidioecesis Sancti Ferdinandi



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 17 March 1975
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 2,180 (842 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcasf.com/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, San Jose, San Fernando, 2000 Pampanga, Philippines
  • Telephone: (045)961.28.19
  • Fax: 961.67.72

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of San Fernando
11 December 1948ErectedArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of San Fernando (erected)
12 June 1955Territory LostDiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
Diocese of San Fernando
Territorial Prelature of Iba (erected)
16 February 1963Territory LostDiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
Diocese of San Fernando
Diocese of Tarlac (erected)
Archdiocese of San Fernando
17 March 1975ElevatedDiocese of San Fernando Archdiocese of San Fernando

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of San Fernando
1950884,338982,76590.0%103131167,6233089ap1951
1970657,289799,10482.3%97121096,030168359ap1971
Archdiocese of San Fernando
1980968,0001,043,00092.8%7898711,1261610451ap1981
19901,435,0001,455,00098.6%1192314210,1052810064ap1991
19992,037,2182,765,87273.7%1281614414,1473810884ap2000
20002,671,4872,840,17894.1%1341414818,0503814284ap2001
20012,732,4202,978,85091.7%1381815617,5154414484ap2002
20022,791,4442,998,19493.1%1411615717,7794314590ap2003
20032,865,5303,115,02092.0%1441616017,9094315592ap2004
20042,800,0003,000,00093.3%1451716217,2835215293ap2005
20103,145,0003,370,00093.3%1501416419,1763611892ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jul 2014