Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renato Pine Mayugba

Bishop of Laoag, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1955 Born
25 Apr 198125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
18 Oct 200549.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
18 Oct 200549.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuriones
27 Dec 200550.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuriones
12 Oct 201256.8AppointedBishop of Laoag, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Renato Pine Mayugba
Bishop Renato Pine Mayugba (born ) Bishop of Laoag

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSampaloc

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Laoag.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,022
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018