Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestino Rojo Enverga

Deceased

Bishop of Daet


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1924BornJosé Panganiban
25 Mar 195026.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 197450.1AppointedBishop of Daet, Philippines
1 Sep 197450.4Ordained BishopBishop of Daet, Philippines
16 Oct 199066.5DiedBishop of Daet, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Celestino Rojo Enverga:
Bishop Celestino Rojo Enverga (born , died ) Bishop of Daet

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013