Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Xavier Labayen, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Infanta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1926BornTalisay
4 Jun 195528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
26 Jul 196640.0AppointedPrelate of Infanta, Philippines
26 Jul 196640.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinnuara
8 Sep 196640.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinnuara
18 Feb 197851.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Sinnuara
28 Jun 200376.9RetiredPrelate of Infanta, Philippines
27 Apr 201689.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of Infanta, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Julio Xavier Labayen
Bishop Julio Xavier Labayen O.C.D. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Infanta

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 26 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016