Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arquimínio Rodrigues da Costa

Bishop Emeritus of Macau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1924 BornSão Mateus
6 Oct 194925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Macau, China
20 Jan 197651.5AppointedBishop of Macau, China
25 Mar 197651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
6 Oct 198864.2ResignedBishop of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Arquimínio Rodrigues da Costa:
Bishop Arquimínio Rodrigues da Costa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Macau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013