Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Maria Obviar y Aranda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lucena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1889BornLipa
15 Mar 191929.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lipa, Philippines
11 Mar 194454.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lipa, Philippines
11 Mar 194454.5AppointedTitular Bishop of LinoŽ
29 Jun 194454.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of LinoŽ
4 Nov 195061.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lucena, Philippines
21 Jun 196979.8AppointedBishop of Lucena, Philippines
25 Sep 197687.1RetiredBishop of Lucena, Philippines
1 Oct 197889.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lucena, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Maria Obviar y Aranda:
Bishop Alfredo Maria Obviar y Aranda (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lucena

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1944, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013