Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Joseph Nicolas, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fiji Island, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Panopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1860Born
22 Sep 188828.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
12 Aug 191858.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fiji Island, Pacific (Oceania)
12 Aug 191858.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Panopolis
2 Feb 191958.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panopolis
2 Apr 192262.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Fiji Island, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Aug 194181.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Fiji Island, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Charles-Joseph Nicolas
Bishop Charles-Joseph Nicolas S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fiji Island

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJussy, France

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018