Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Quinn

Deceased

Bishop of Bathurst


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1820BornEadestown, Ireland
15 Feb 184524.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 186545.2AppointedBishop of Bathurst, Australia
14 Nov 186545.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst, Australia
1 Nov 186646.6InstalledBishop of Bathurst, Australia
16 Jan 188564.8DiedBishop of Bathurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Matthew Quinn:
Bishop Matthew Quinn (born , died ) Bishop of Bathurst

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013