Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christopher Augustine Reynolds

Deceased

Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1834Born
20 Apr 186025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Adelaide, Australia
13 Jun 187338.8AppointedBishop of Adelaide, Australia
2 Nov 187339.2Ordained BishopBishop of Adelaide, Australia
13 May 188752.8AppointedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
16 Jun 189358.8DiedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Christopher Augustine Reynolds
Archbishop Christopher Augustine Reynolds (born , died ) Archbishop of Adelaide

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopAdelaide, Diocese of Adelaide

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017