Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Gibney

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Perth

Titular Bishop of Balanea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1837BornKillestrandra, Ireland
14 Jun 186325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
28 Sep 188648.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Perth, Australia
28 Sep 188648.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
1 Nov 188649.0SucceededBishop of Perth, Australia
23 Jan 188749.2Ordained BishopBishop of Perth, Australia
14 Jul 191072.7ResignedBishop of Perth, Australia
14 Jul 191072.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Balanea
22 Jun 192587.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for Matthew Gibney:
Bishop Matthew Gibney (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Perth

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 307, and Page 447
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013