Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Rudesindo Salvado, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of New Norcia

Titular Bishop of Hadriani ad Olympum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1814BornTuy, Spain
26 Jul 183016.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Feb 183924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Aug 184935.4AppointedBishop of Victoria, Australia
15 Aug 184935.4Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, Australia
12 Mar 186753.0AppointedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
1 Aug 188874.4ResignedBishop of Victoria, Australia
29 Mar 188975.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadriani ad Olympum
29 Dec 190086.8DiedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia

MicroData Summary for Rudesindo Salvado:
Abbot Rudesindo Salvado O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of New Norcia

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 51.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 77, and Page 590
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1700, Page 158, Number 865

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015