Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Bisceglia

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1803BornCerignola
14 Apr 182723.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 185148.1SelectedBishop of Termoli, Italy
5 Sep 185148.2ConfirmedBishop of Termoli, Italy
5 Oct 185148.3Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
12 Feb 188985.6DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bisceglia
Bishop Vincenzo Bisceglia (born , died ) Bishop of Termoli

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 549
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1851, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Dec 2016