Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Marie (John Mary) Odin, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1800Born
8 Nov 182222.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
4 May 182323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 Aug 184040.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
16 Jul 184141.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Texas, USA
6 Mar 184242.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
21 May 184747.2AppointedBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
15 Feb 186160.9AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
25 May 187070.2DiedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie (John Mary) Odin (VIAF: 18943056)
Archbishop Jean Marie (John Mary) Odin C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbierle, France

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 281, and Page 418
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 153
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,842, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast