Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Marie Dubuis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galveston, Texas

Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1817BornCoutouvre, France
1 Jun 184427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
21 Oct 186245.6AppointedBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
23 Nov 186245.7Ordained BishopBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
4 Dec 189275.7RetiredBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
21 Jan 189375.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
22 May 189578.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Galveston, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Claude Marie Dubuis:
Bishop Claude Marie Dubuis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galveston

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 117, and Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013