Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Monteforte

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1788Born
3 Apr 181324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
20 Apr 184960.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
20 Apr 184960.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
10 Jun 184960.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
10 Feb 187586.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Monteforte
Bishop Camillo Monteforte (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 517
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017