Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio de Simone

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1789Born
18 Sep 181324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
28 Sep 184960.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
16 Dec 184960.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
18 Mar 185868.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
1871¹81.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Simone
Archbishop Antonio de Simone (born , died 1871) Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopSan Carlo, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 249, and Page 302
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017