Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Carlo Vittore Papardo del Parco, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1817Born
14 Mar 184022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
27 Sep 185841.1AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
27 Sep 185841.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
23 Oct 185841.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
27 Oct 187154.2AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
22 Nov 187457.3DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Carlo Vittore Papardo del Parco
Bishop Ignazio Carlo Vittore Papardo del Parco C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 398, and Page 434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1858, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017