Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Cammarota

Deceased

Archbishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1809Born
22 Feb 183424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gaeta, Italy
28 Sep 184939.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gaeta, Italy
28 Sep 184939.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
31 Dec 184940.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
7 Jun 185444.5SelectedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
23 Jun 185444.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
23 Feb 187666.2DiedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Cammarota
Archbishop Filippo Cammarota (born , died ) Archbishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTraetto, Archdiocese of Gaeta

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 169, and Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017