Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Terenzio

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1786BornFondi nel Lazio
21 Apr 181024.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 183751.2SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
19 May 183751.3ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
4 Jun 183751.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
24 Sep 183751.6InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy
27 Jan 185468.0DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Terenzio
Bishop Benedetto Terenzio (born , died ) Bishop of Trivento

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,226
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 378
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016