Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Cosenza

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1788³BornNapoli
14 Mar 181224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
21 Mar 183244.0SelectedBishop of Andria, Italy
2 Jul 183244.3ConfirmedBishop of Andria, Italy
8 Jul 183244.3Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
10 Sep 185062.5SelectedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
30 Sep 185062.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 185062.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
3 Oct 185062.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
30 Mar 186375.1DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Cosenza (VIAF: 89732968)
Giuseppe Cardinal Cosenza (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
  • a cardinal for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 180, and Page 51
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1832, Number 24
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1850

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016