Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Iannuzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1801BornAndria
18 Sep 182423.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 184342.2SelectedBishop of Lucera, Italy
19 Jun 184342.4ConfirmedBishop of Lucera, Italy
25 Jun 184342.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
21 Aug 187170.6DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Iannuzzi:
Bishop Giuseppe Iannuzzi (born , died ) Bishop of Lucera

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013