Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Saverio Maria Cardinal Apuzzo

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1807BornNapoli
18 Sep 183023.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 185446.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy
19 Jan 185446.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
12 Mar 185446.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
18 Jan 185547.7SelectedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
23 Mar 185547.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
24 Nov 187164.6AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
12 Mar 187769.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 187769.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
30 Jul 188073.3DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Maria Apuzzo (VIAF: 30412916)
Francesco Saverio Maria Cardinal Apuzzo (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,535
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98, and Page 180
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 530, and Page 48
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1854, Number 7
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016