Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Centore

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy

Titular Bishop of Tlos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1816Born
14 Apr 183822.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Capua, Italy
22 Dec 183822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Capua, Italy
28 Jan 187659.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy
28 Jan 187659.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
30 Apr 187660.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
10 Apr 189882.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Centore
Bishop Antonio Centore (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasanova, Archdiocese of Capua
Ordained BishopCathedral, Capua, Archdiocese of Capua

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,098
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 557
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,876, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast