Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Bottiglia Savoulx

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1752BornCavour, Italy
26 Dec 179139.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 182674.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
2 Apr 182674.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Perge
23 Jun 183482.3Elevated to Cardinal
1 Aug 183482.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
27 Nov 183482.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
14 Sep 183684.5DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bottiglia Savoulx (VIAF: 14760272)
Luigi Cardinal Bottiglia Savoulx (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
  • a cardinal for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 302
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 9
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016