Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Iavarone

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1788BornNapoli
23 May 181224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
21 Mar 183243.8SelectedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
2 Jul 183244.1ConfirmedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
8 Jul 183244.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
20 Dec 184860.6SelectedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
20 Apr 184960.9ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
19 Aug 185466.2DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Iavarone (VIAF: 89096182)
Bishop Francesco Iavarone (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 79
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 90
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1832, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Jul 2016