Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Negri

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1788Born
12 Jun 181324.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 183344.3SelectedBishop of Tortona, Italy
15 Apr 183344.4ConfirmedBishop of Tortona, Italy
21 Apr 183344.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
19 Jan 187485.1DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Negri
Bishop Giovanni Negri (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontanetto

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1833, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast