Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Giuseppe Vaggi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1798BornGenova
28 Apr 181718.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
7 Apr 182122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Feb 184950.6SelectedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
28 Sep 184951.2ConfirmedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
8 Dec 184951.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
22 Nov 186971.3DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Giuseppe Vaggi
Bishop Pier Giuseppe Vaggi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1849, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016